This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/23/2021 at 08:42:21 (UTC).

USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. VS. CARLOS MADRID

Case Summary

On 11/13/2014 USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CARLOS MADRID. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC.

Defendant

CARLOS MADRID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID J. HARTER, APC

Defendant Attorney

WLA LEGAL SERVICES, INC.

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE AND RECEIPT FOR TRANSFER OF RECORDS

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE AND RECEIPT FOR TRANSFER OF RECORDS

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER/WRIT OF ATTACHMENT 03/05/2015 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER/WRIT OF ATTACHMENT 03/05/2015 02:00:00 PM.

CASE FILE CONTENTS TRANSFERRED TO RECEIVING COURT LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER. .

CASE FILE CONTENTS TRANSFERRED TO RECEIVING COURT LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER. .

NOTICE OF TRANSFER

NOTICE OF TRANSFER

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE (TRANSFER) 02/26/2015 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE (TRANSFER) 02/26/2015 02:00:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 39 - CHANGE OF VENUE IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11743690 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11567881.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 39 - CHANGE OF VENUE IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11743690 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11567881.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - MOTION/NOTICE TO CONTINUE HEARING OR CMC IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11742204 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11566402.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - MOTION/NOTICE TO CONTINUE HEARING OR CMC IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11742204 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11566402.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 02/25/2015

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 02/25/2015

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY MADRID, CARLOS ON 02/25/2015

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY MADRID, CARLOS ON 02/25/2015

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY MADRID, CARLOS ON 02/19/2015

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY MADRID, CARLOS ON 02/19/2015

OPPOSITION FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 02/11/2015

OPPOSITION FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 02/11/2015

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 02/05/2015

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 02/05/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11729699 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11553942.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11729699 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11553942.

MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE FILED BY MADRID, CARLOS ON 01/29/2015

MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE FILED BY MADRID, CARLOS ON 01/29/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11725962 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11550224.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11725962 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11550224.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 01/22/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 01/22/2015

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 01/22/2015

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 01/22/2015

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 01/22/2015

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 01/22/2015

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE AND RECEIPT FOR TRANSFER OF RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER/WRIT OF ATTACHMENT 03/05/2015 02:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILE CONTENTS TRANSFERRED TO RECEIVING COURT LOS ANGELES PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE (TRANSFER) 02/26/2015 02:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 39 - CHANGE OF VENUE IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11743690 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11567881.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - MOTION/NOTICE TO CONTINUE HEARING OR CMC IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11742204 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11566402.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 02/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4334013 RECEIVED ON 02/25/2015 11:29:14 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY MADRID, CARLOS ON 02/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/22/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 12/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1215914 RECEIVED ON 12/29/2014 01:42:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/10/2015 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11691258 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11515521.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1204269 RECEIVED ON 11/13/2014 01:59:24 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER NAKAMURA, KIRK ON 11/13/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 11/13/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 11/13/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 11/13/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES INC is a litigant