This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:32:45 (UTC).

U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC VS. RUSSELL THORNTON

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 U S REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RUSSELL THORNTON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC

Defendant

RUSSELL THORNTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TODD A. BRISCO & ASSOCIATES, APC

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 10/16/2017

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 10/16/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 11/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 11/02/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12248128 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12071850.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12248128 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12071850.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 11/02/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 11/02/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/06/17) RECEIVED ON 11/02/2017.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/06/17) RECEIVED ON 11/02/2017.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 11/17/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 11/17/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 11/29/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 11/29/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 11/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 11/02/2017

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/13/2017.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/13/2017.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/06/17) RECEIVED ON 11/02/2017.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/06/17) RECEIVED ON 11/02/2017.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233788 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057470.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233788 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057470.

JUDGMENT FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 11/30/2017

JUDGMENT FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 11/30/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12236835 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12060515.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12236835 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12060515.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 10/10/2017

JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/29/2017.

JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/29/2017.

COMPLAINT FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 10/10/2017

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 11/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/29/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 11/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2616799 RECEIVED ON 11/29/2017 03:02:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 10/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12236835 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12060515.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/13/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1430758 RECEIVED ON 10/13/2017 07:36:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233788 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057470.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY U.S. REIF MG MADISON PARK CA, LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1428974 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 11:21:33 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.