This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 09:38:40 (UTC).

UPFRONT LABS, LLC VS. RYAN BAKER

Case Summary

On 04/10/2017 UPFRONT LABS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RYAN BAKER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UPFRONT LABS, LLC

Defendant

RYAN BAKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEONARD S. KIRSCHEN

CHRISTIAN EMSIEK

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY UPFRONT LABS, LLC ON 04/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY UPFRONT LABS, LLC ON 04/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UPFRONT LABS, LLC ON 04/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UPFRONT LABS, LLC ON 04/10/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12136873 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11960656.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12136873 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11960656.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BANKS, ANDREW ON 04/10/2017.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BANKS, ANDREW ON 04/10/2017.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UPFRONT LABS, LLC ON 04/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UPFRONT LABS, LLC ON 04/10/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/21/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/21/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY UPFRONT LABS, LLC ON 09/19/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY UPFRONT LABS, LLC ON 09/19/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/21/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/21/2017 09:00:00 AM.

CASE REASSIGNED TO MELISSA MCCORMICK EFFECTIVE 11/06/2017.

CASE REASSIGNED TO MELISSA MCCORMICK EFFECTIVE 11/06/2017.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY UPFRONT LABS, LLC ON 11/06/2017

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY UPFRONT LABS, LLC ON 11/06/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY UPFRONT LABS, LLC ON 11/06/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY UPFRONT LABS, LLC ON 11/06/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY UPFRONT LABS, LLC ON 11/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1438035 RECEIVED ON 11/06/2017 02:36:03 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY UPFRONT LABS, LLC ON 11/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4784900 RECEIVED ON 11/06/2017 02:34:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE REASSIGNED TO C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 11/09/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO MELISSA MCCORMICK EFFECTIVE 11/06/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/21/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 11/09/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY UPFRONT LABS, LLC ON 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2594263 RECEIVED ON 09/19/2017 04:08:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/21/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4706521 RECEIVED ON 04/10/2017 04:25:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UPFRONT LABS, LLC ON 04/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BANKS, ANDREW ON 04/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12136873 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11960656.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UPFRONT LABS, LLC ON 04/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY UPFRONT LABS, LLC ON 04/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3532109 RECEIVED ON 04/10/2017 01:58:25 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Upfront Labs, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIRSCHEN LEONARD S.