This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/31/2020 at 06:56:39 (UTC).

UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION VS. WALUSHKA AUTO HOUSE LLC

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WALUSHKA AUTO HOUSE LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION

Defendants

CHRISTOPHER WALUSHKA

WALUSHKA AUTO HOUSE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Schulze

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION ON 11/18/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION ON 11/18/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION ON 12/16/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION ON 12/16/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION ON 11/18/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION ON 11/18/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION ON 11/18/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION ON 11/18/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION ON 01/08/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION ON 01/08/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12661548 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12486229.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12661548 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12486229.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION ON 12/16/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION ON 12/16/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3874386 RECEIVED ON 01/08/2020 11:08:48 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION ON 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION ON 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1699391 RECEIVED ON 12/16/2019 03:11:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION ON 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41045744 RECEIVED ON 12/16/2019 03:00:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12661548 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12486229.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION ON 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION ON 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION ON 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1689255 RECEIVED ON 11/18/2019 09:46:16 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less