This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/09/2019 at 06:41:35 (UTC).

UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS. CONSUMER AUTO CREDIT, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CONSUMER AUTO CREDIT, INC , A FLORIDA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION, a California corporation

Defendants

CONSUMER AUTO CREDIT, INC., A FLORIDA

RONIEL VASQUEZ

ANGELICA VASQUEZ

CONSUMER AUTO CREDIT, INC., a Florida corporation

JIMMY ESPEJO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

United Auto Credit Corporation

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 09/26/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 09/26/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 09/26/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 09/26/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 09/26/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 09/26/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12629555 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12454054.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12629555 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12454054.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 10/29/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 10/29/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 10/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3850880 RECEIVED ON 10/29/2019 09:25:33 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12629555 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12454054.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 09/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 09/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY UNITED AUTO CREDIT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 09/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1670707 RECEIVED ON 09/26/2019 04:08:16 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less