This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/21/2022 at 10:25:52 (UTC).

UMB BANK, N.A. VS. SYNRGO, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 UMB BANK, N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SYNRGO, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

UMB Bank, N.A.

Other and Defendant

Synrgo, Inc.

Interested Parties

Chicago Title Company

Chicago Title Insurance Company

County of Los Angeles

Douglas Wilson

Fidelity National Title Company

Fidelity National Title Insurance Company

Lawyers Title Company

Ticor Title Company

WFG National Title Insuance Company

County of Monterey

Finance and Insurance Services, Inc.

Sherman Management Services, Inc.

The Bank of Hemet

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

Other and Defendant Attorney

OKeefe & Associates Law Corporation

Interested Party Attorneys

Cooley LLP

RIMON P.C.

Buchalter

Wolfe & Wyman LLP

The Guerin Law Firm

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/11/2021

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/11/2021

ORDER - OTHER (ORDER GRANTING RECEIVER'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO APPROVE PROPOSED ADDENDUM TO ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER TO PROVIDE NOTICE) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/23/2021

ORDER - OTHER (ORDER GRANTING RECEIVER'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO APPROVE PROPOSED ADDENDUM TO ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER TO PROVIDE NOTICE) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/23/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SYNRGO, INC. ON 10/12/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SYNRGO, INC. ON 10/12/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/23/2021 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/23/2021 08:45:00 AM.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WILSON, DOUGLAS ON 07/09/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WILSON, DOUGLAS ON 07/09/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SYNRGO, INC. ON 02/09/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SYNRGO, INC. ON 02/09/2022

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21110450 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21110450 REJECTED.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SYNRGO, INC. ON 02/02/2022

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SYNRGO, INC. ON 02/02/2022

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31114213 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31114213 REJECTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 02/03/2022 02:02:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 02/03/2022 02:02:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/03/2022 01:38:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/03/2022 01:38:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/01/2022 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/01/2022 10:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13001500 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12829419.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13001500 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12829419.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY SYNRGO, INC. ON 01/31/2022

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY SYNRGO, INC. ON 01/31/2022

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY SYNRGO, INC. ON 01/31/2022

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY SYNRGO, INC. ON 01/31/2022

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY SYNRGO, INC. ON 01/31/2022

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY SYNRGO, INC. ON 01/31/2022

220 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GOODING; Department: C31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: MOTION - OTHER; Judge: SUPERVISING; Department: C12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: MOTION - OTHER; Judge: GOODING; Department: C31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO ENFORCE COURT ORDER; Judge: GOODING; Department: C31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SYNRGO, INC. ON 02/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31118461 RECEIVED ON 02/09/2022 03:27:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21110450 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21117929 RECEIVED ON 02/02/2022 01:42:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31114213 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
370 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY UMB BANK, N.A. ON 05/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41198975 RECEIVED ON 05/27/2021 05:58:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/25/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12887948 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12715727.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41194102 RECEIVED ON 05/14/2021 08:46:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GOODING, MARTHA ON 05/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UMB BANK, N.A. ON 05/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UMB BANK, N.A. ON 05/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY UMB BANK, N.A. ON 05/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synrgo, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE BANK OF HEMET is a litigant

Latest cases where LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where UMB Bank National Association is a litigant