This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 12:34:31 (UTC).

UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. VS. THOMAS KNIGHT

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 UDR HARBOR GREENS, L P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against THOMAS KNIGHT. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UDR Harbor Greens, L.P.

Defendant

Thomas Knight

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd A. Brisco & Associates, APC

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY EFFICIENTLEGALSUPPORT FOR 214 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13100704 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12928706.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY EFFICIENTLEGALSUPPORT FOR 214 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13100704 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12928706.

WRIT ISSUED ON 09/02/2022

WRIT ISSUED ON 09/02/2022

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/08/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/08/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/08/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/08/2022

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/10/2022

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/10/2022

VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/08/2022

VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/08/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/08/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/08/2022

CASE INITIATION FORM(S) HAVE BEEN GENERATED.

CASE INITIATION FORM(S) HAVE BEEN GENERATED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY EFFICIENTLEGALSUPPORT FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13067591 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12895587.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY EFFICIENTLEGALSUPPORT FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13067591 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12895587.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 06/21/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 06/21/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 06/21/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 06/21/2022

PLAINTIFF'S MANDATORY COVER SHEET AND SUPPLEMENTAL ALLEGATIONS - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 06/21/2022

PLAINTIFF'S MANDATORY COVER SHEET AND SUPPLEMENTAL ALLEGATIONS - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 06/21/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 06/21/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 06/21/2022

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 10/24/2022

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 10/24/2022

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 10/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY EFFICIENTLEGALSUPPORT FOR 214 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13100704 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12928706.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED ON 09/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41375954 RECEIVED ON 08/24/2022 08:14:28 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41369075 RECEIVED ON 08/08/2022 02:53:07 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE INITIATION FORM(S) HAVE BEEN GENERATED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY EFFICIENTLEGALSUPPORT FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13067591 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12895587.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11003344 RECEIVED ON 06/21/2022 02:12:21 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER KNILL, KIMBERLY ON 06/21/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 06/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 06/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MANDATORY COVER SHEET AND SUPPLEMENTAL ALLEGATIONS - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 06/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 06/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less