**********************-CJC
06/27/2022
Not Classified By Court
Property - Residential Eviction
Orange, California
UDR Harbor Greens, L.P.
Seth Allen
Todd A. Brisco & Associates, APC
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/17/2022
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/17/2022
JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/18/2022
VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/17/2022
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/17/2022
CASE INITIATION FORM(S) HAVE BEEN GENERATED.
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY EFFICIENTLEGALSUPPORT FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13070006 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12898002.
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 06/27/2022
PLAINTIFF'S MANDATORY COVER SHEET AND SUPPLEMENTAL ALLEGATIONS - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 06/27/2022
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 06/27/2022
COMPLAINT FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 06/27/2022
APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/30/2022
WRIT ISSUED ON 09/19/2022
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY EFFICIENTLEGALSUPPORT FOR 214 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13108012 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12936025.
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 10/31/2022
DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 10/31/2022
[-] Read LessDocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY EFFICIENTLEGALSUPPORT FOR 214 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13108012 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12936025.
[-] Read LessDocketWRIT ISSUED ON 09/19/2022
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31200805 RECEIVED ON 08/30/2022 02:50:09 PM.
[-] Read LessDocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/30/2022
[-] Read LessDocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK
[-] Read LessDocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.
[-] Read LessDocketJUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/18/2022
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31195323 RECEIVED ON 08/17/2022 04:09:30 PM.
[-] Read LessDocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/17/2022
[-] Read LessDocketVERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/17/2022
[-] Read LessDocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 08/17/2022
[-] Read LessDocketCASE INITIATION FORM(S) HAVE BEEN GENERATED.
[-] Read LessDocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY EFFICIENTLEGALSUPPORT FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13070006 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12898002.
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11005352 RECEIVED ON 06/25/2022 11:19:14 AM.
[-] Read LessDocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER KNILL, KIMBERLY ON 06/27/2022.
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 06/27/2022
[-] Read LessDocketPLAINTIFF'S MANDATORY COVER SHEET AND SUPPLEMENTAL ALLEGATIONS - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 06/27/2022
[-] Read LessDocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 06/27/2022
[-] Read LessDocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 06/27/2022
[-] Read Less