This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:53:03 (UTC).

UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. VS. GIANNA SIMONELLI

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 UDR HARBOR GREENS, L P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GIANNA SIMONELLI. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P.

Defendant

GIANNA SIMONELLI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TODD A. BRISCO & ASSOCIATES, APC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 05/10/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 05/10/2016

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/18/2016.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/18/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 04/18/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 04/18/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 04/18/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 04/18/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 04/18/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 04/18/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 03/29/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 03/29/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11935564 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11759749.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11935564 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11759749.

WRIT (ISSUED 03/14/16) RECEIVED ON 03/11/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 03/14/16) RECEIVED ON 03/11/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 03/11/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 03/11/2016

JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED 03/14/16) RECEIVED ON 03/11/2016.

JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED 03/14/16) RECEIVED ON 03/11/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 03/11/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 03/11/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 03/11/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 03/11/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (& CLERK'S JUDGMENT) FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 03/11/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (& CLERK'S JUDGMENT) FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 03/11/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927561 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751786.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927561 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751786.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 05/10/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/18/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 04/18/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 04/18/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 04/18/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1317539 RECEIVED ON 04/18/2016 05:07:54 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 03/29/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 03/11/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 03/11/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (& CLERK'S JUDGMENT) FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 03/11/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1309597 RECEIVED ON 03/11/2016 04:41:46 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927561 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751786.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY UDR HARBOR GREENS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4509874 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 04:29:23 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UDR Harbor Greens, L.P. is a litigant