This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 04:02:29 (UTC).

TYRENE SCHECHTER VS. NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 TYRENE SCHECHTER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TYRENE SCHECHTER

Defendant

NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAWYERS FOR EMPLOYEE AND CONSUMER RIGHTS

Defendant Attorney

Mohajerian, APLC

Other Attorneys

LAWYERS FOR EMPLOYEE AND CONSUMER RIGH

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 01/03/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 01/03/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 01/03/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 01/03/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 01/03/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 01/03/2019

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 01/03/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 01/03/2019.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 01/03/2019.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 01/03/2019.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/17/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/17/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 01/11/2019

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 01/11/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 02/04/2019

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 02/04/2019

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 03/18/2019

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 03/18/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12519971 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12343730.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12519971 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12343730.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 04/02/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 04/02/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 04/10/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 04/10/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/17/2019 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/17/2019 08:30:00 AM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3791546 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3791546 REJECTED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 06/03/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 06/03/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 06/03/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 06/03/2019

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 06/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 06/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1629637 RECEIVED ON 06/03/2019 02:13:58 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3791546 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/17/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketTHE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 12/27/2019 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C33.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketTHE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/27/2020 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C33.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/27/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketSCHECHTER, TYRENE REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 01/11/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 01/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/17/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 01/03/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 01/03/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 01/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 01/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 01/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SCHECHTER, TYRENE ON 01/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4922551 RECEIVED ON 01/03/2019 12:19:18 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less