This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/24/2018 at 09:29:08 (UTC).

TUCKER - TRUST

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 TUCKER - TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Respondents and Petitioners

TIMOTHY L RANDALL

JUAN CUEVAS

RUBEN MANRIQUEZ

SANDRA ANDERSEN

TERRIE GUERTIN

RAY MANRIQUEZ

BERTHA TORRES

JENNIFER CAMPION

DONALD SELBY

JUVENTINA CUEVAS

HAYES B MILLIMAN

Appellant and Respondent

HAYES B MILLIMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorneys

BAKER & BAKER APC

ROSS WERSCHING & WOLCOTT, LLP

MADRID LAW GROUP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2653791 RECEIVED ON 03/23/2018 06:06:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY RANDALL, TIMOTHY L. ON 03/23/2018; Filing Party: RANDALL, TIMOTHY L. ON 03/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 03/21/2018 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4825818 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3644570 RECEIVED ON 03/09/2018 11:28:39 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • OPPOSITION (P) FILED BY RANDALL, TIMOTHY L. ON 03/09/2018; Filing Party: RANDALL, TIMOTHY L. ON 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2564195 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE 02/07/2018 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3627957 RECEIVED ON 01/19/2018 05:42:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
566 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2016
  • (P) TRUST PETITION SCHEDULED FOR 06/30/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C06 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 202 - SUBSEQUENT PAPERS: PETITIONS, OBJECTIONS, OR OTHER PAPERS IN OPPOSITION FOR ORDERS THAT ARE FILED AFTER ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTR IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11940636 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11764820.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2452617 RECEIVED ON 03/21/2016 02:02:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • PETITION (SUBSEQUENT) FILED BY RANDALL, TIMOTHY L. ON 03/21/2016; Filing Party: RANDALL, TIMOTHY L. ON 03/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3386665 RECEIVED ON 03/02/2016 09:47:04 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • NOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING FILED BY RANDALL, TIMOTHY L. ON 03/02/2016; Filing Party: RANDALL, TIMOTHY L. ON 03/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • (P) TRUST PETITION SCHEDULED FOR 06/06/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C06 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 199 - INTERNAL AFFAIRS IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928070 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752295.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509462 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 10:14:02 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • TRUST PETITION FILED BY RANDALL, TIMOTHY L. ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: RANDALL, TIMOTHY L. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.