This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 09:19:25 (UTC).

TRINIDAD CRUZ SOLIS VS. SURF CITY NISSAN

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 TRINIDAD CRUZ SOLIS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SURF CITY NISSAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trinidad Cruz Solis

Defendants

American Contractor's Indemnity Company

Ghreiwati Auto Group

Santander Consumer USA Inc.

Surf City Nissan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Office of Ben Roberts

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/25/2021

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/25/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/17/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/17/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 08/24/2021.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 08/24/2021.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOLIS, TRINIDAD CRUZ ON 08/24/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOLIS, TRINIDAD CRUZ ON 08/24/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOLIS, TRINIDAD CRUZ ON 08/24/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOLIS, TRINIDAD CRUZ ON 08/24/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY SOLIS, TRINIDAD CRUZ ON 08/24/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY SOLIS, TRINIDAD CRUZ ON 08/24/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MCCORMICK; Department: C13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketSOLIS, TRINIDAD CRUZ REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 08/25/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/17/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 08/24/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY SOLIS, TRINIDAD CRUZ ON 08/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 08/24/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOLIS, TRINIDAD CRUZ ON 08/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOLIS, TRINIDAD CRUZ ON 08/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SOLIS, TRINIDAD CRUZ ON 08/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31054185 RECEIVED ON 08/24/2021 09:32:01 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC. AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION DBA CHRYSLER CAPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant