This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/18/2018 at 07:48:49 (UTC).

TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES VS. ALLYSHA S. WINGATE

Case Summary

On 08/16/2016 TRIBOLET ASSOCIATES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALLYSHA S WINGATE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES

Defendants

HEATHER PEREZ

ALLYSHA S. WINGATE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TODD A. BRISCO & ASSOCIATES, APC

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES ON 10/11/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES ON 10/11/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12034666 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11858671.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12034666 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11858671.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 09/23/16) RECEIVED ON 09/19/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 09/23/16) RECEIVED ON 09/19/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES ON 09/19/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES ON 09/19/2016

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES ON 09/15/2016

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES ON 09/15/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 09/15/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 09/15/2016 09:00:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY WINGATE, ALLYSHA S.; PEREZ, HEATHER ON 09/07/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY WINGATE, ALLYSHA S.; PEREZ, HEATHER ON 09/07/2016

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/15/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/15/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES ON 08/25/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES ON 08/25/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES ON 08/25/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES ON 08/25/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES ON 08/25/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES ON 08/25/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES ON 08/25/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES ON 08/25/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2488668 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2488668 REJECTED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/23/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/23/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/23/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/23/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WINGATE, ALLYSHA S.; PEREZ, HEATHER ON 08/23/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WINGATE, ALLYSHA S.; PEREZ, HEATHER ON 08/23/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12015764 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11839814.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12015764 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11839814.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES ON 10/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12034666 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11858671.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 09/23/16) RECEIVED ON 09/19/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES ON 09/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1344206 RECEIVED ON 09/19/2016 01:37:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES ON 09/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 09/15/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • POSSESSION OF THE FOLLOWING PROPERTY: 109 S. LINCOLN AVENUE #4, FULLERTON, CA 92831 IS AWARDED TO PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY PEREZ, HEATHER ON 08/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • WINGATE, ALLYSHA S. REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 08/23/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY WINGATE, ALLYSHA S. ON 08/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WINGATE, ALLYSHA S.; PEREZ, HEATHER ON 08/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12015764 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11839814.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES ON 08/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES ON 08/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY TRIBOLET & ASSOCIATES ON 08/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2486292 RECEIVED ON 08/16/2016 10:17:20 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less