This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:19:45 (UTC).

TRI NGUYEN VS HUYEN NGUYEN

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 TRI NGUYEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HUYEN NGUYEN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1676

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NGUYEN, TRI DINH

Respondent

NGUYEN, HUYEN THANH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LE, VICKIE DUYENHANG

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2017
  • WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 09/20/2017; Filing Party: NGUYEN, TRI DINH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 07/28/2017; Filing Party: NGUYEN, TRI DINH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 07/28/2017; Filing Party: NGUYEN, TRI DINH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 07/07/2017; Filing Party: NGUYEN, TRI DINH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/07/2017; Filing Party: NGUYEN, TRI DINH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • RETURN SHEET - DEFAULT & JUDGMENT 01/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2016
  • RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 11/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 10/20/2016; Filing Party: NGUYEN, TRI DINH

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2016
  • SUMMONS - AMENDED PETITION 08/18/2016; Filing Party: NGUYEN, TRI DINH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • PETITION - AMENDED 08/18/2016; Filing Party: NGUYEN, TRI DINH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • RETURN SHEET - DEFAULT & JUDGMENT 07/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 04/18/2016; Filing Party: NGUYEN, TRI DINH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 04/06/2016; Filing Party: NGUYEN, TRI DINH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • RETURN SHEET - CLERKS OFFICE 04/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: NGUYEN, TRI DINH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 02/26/2016; Filing Party: NGUYEN, TRI DINH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: NGUYEN, TRI DINH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: NGUYEN, TRI DINH

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.