This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/11/2017 at 08:23:15 (UTC).

TRACY FULTON VS. GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC

Case Summary

On 10/29/2014 TRACY FULTON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRACY FULTON

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Others

GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC

MARTIN MORALES

MORALES LANDSCAPING & GARDEN SERVICES

MARTIN MORALES AVALOS

JERRY WANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTLESEY STORM LLP

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN W. SEDACH A.P.C.

LAW OFFICES OF NICHOLAS T. BASAKIS

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS 04/19/2017 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS 04/19/2017 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CMC: BANKRUPTCY REMOVAL 03/30/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CMC: BANKRUPTCY REMOVAL 03/30/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC ON 03/24/2017

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC ON 03/24/2017

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY FULTON, TRACY ON 03/21/2017

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY FULTON, TRACY ON 03/21/2017

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY FULTON, TRACY ON 03/21/2017

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY FULTON, TRACY ON 03/21/2017

CMC: BANKRUPTCY REMOVAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/30/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CMC: BANKRUPTCY REMOVAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/30/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/03/2017 10:58:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/03/2017 10:58:00 AM.

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. DEREK HUNT) FILED BY FULTON, TRACY ON 02/27/2017

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. DEREK HUNT) FILED BY FULTON, TRACY ON 02/27/2017

CASE REASSIGNED TO DEREK HUNT EFFECTIVE 03/06/2017.

CASE REASSIGNED TO DEREK HUNT EFFECTIVE 03/06/2017.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC ON 02/17/2017

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC ON 02/17/2017

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY FULTON, TRACY ON 02/16/2017

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY FULTON, TRACY ON 02/16/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CMC: BANKRUPTCY REMOVAL 02/06/2017 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CMC: BANKRUPTCY REMOVAL 02/06/2017 08:30:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY FULTON, TRACY ON 02/03/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY FULTON, TRACY ON 02/03/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FULTON, TRACY ON 02/03/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FULTON, TRACY ON 02/03/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4636028 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4636028 REJECTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC ON 11/18/2016

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC ON 11/18/2016

164 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS 04/19/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketTHE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 02/02/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C31.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketTHE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 03/05/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C31.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/02/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/05/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CMC: BANKRUPTCY REMOVAL 03/30/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketTHE MOTION FOR ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS IS SCHEDULED FOR 04/19/2017 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT C31.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketMOTION FOR ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS SCHEDULED FOR 04/19/2017 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL, INC ON 03/24/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4698214 RECEIVED ON 03/24/2017 05:28:17 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
298 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/23/2015 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY FULTON, TRACY ON 11/17/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1205115 RECEIVED ON 11/17/2014 12:08:25 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER AGUIRRE, FREDERICK ON 10/29/2014.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11683510 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11507713.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FULTON, TRACY ON 10/29/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY FULTON, TRACY ON 10/29/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FULTON, TRACY ON 10/29/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY FULTON, TRACY ON 10/29/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1199593 RECEIVED ON 10/29/2014 02:10:53 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant