This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 04:14:54 (UTC).

TRACEY E. PRATT VS. ERVIN PAUL RUZICS

Case Summary

On 08/07/2013 TRACEY E PRATT filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ERVIN PAUL RUZICS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LARRY S. PRATT

TRACEY E. PRATT

Defendants

ERVIN PAUL RUZICS, M.D., INC.

LAMIA L. GABAL-SHEHAB

ERVIN PAUL RUZICS

ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE

CHARLES JEFFREY KAUPKE

NEPHROLOGY SPECIALISTS MEDICAL GROUP,

VAISHAL MAHENDRA TOLIA

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIF

EDWARD E. ASTON IV, M.D., INC.

EDWARD E. ASTON

ST. JOSEPH HEALTH SYSTEM

MARYA P. WEIL

EDWARD E. ASTON, IV, M.D.

NEPHROLOGY SPECIALISTS MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

ERVIN P. RUZICS, M.D., INC.

ERVIN P. RUZICS

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE KRISTY LAW FIRM

Defendant Attorneys

DOYLE & SCHAFER, LLP

CARROLL, KELLY, TROTTER, FRANZEN, MCKENNA & PEABODY

CREASON & AARVIG, LLP

LOTZ, DOGGETT & RAWERS, LLP

LAW, BRANDMEYER + PACKER, LLP

SCHMID & VOILES

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11852307 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11676527.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11852307 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11676527.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PRATT, TRACEY E.; PRATT, LARRY S. ON 08/05/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PRATT, TRACEY E.; PRATT, LARRY S. ON 08/05/2015

MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 6) FILED BY PRATT, TRACEY E.; PRATT, LARRY S. ON 05/04/2015

MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 6) FILED BY PRATT, TRACEY E.; PRATT, LARRY S. ON 05/04/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 22 - COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES: COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES FOR CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING MORE THAN 1 HOUR, 227 - SUBSEQUENT JURY TRIAL FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,791.65, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11774773 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11599036.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 22 - COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES: COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES FOR CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING MORE THAN 1 HOUR, 227 - SUBSEQUENT JURY TRIAL FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,791.65, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11774773 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11599036.

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY RUZICS, ERVIN P.; ERVIN P. RUZICS, M.D., INC. ON 04/17/2015

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY RUZICS, ERVIN P.; ERVIN P. RUZICS, M.D., INC. ON 04/17/2015

STATEMENT OF CASE FILED BY ERVIN P. RUZICS, M.D., INC.; RUZICS, ERVIN P.; PRATT, LARRY S.; PRATT, TRACEY E. ON 04/10/2015

STATEMENT OF CASE FILED BY ERVIN P. RUZICS, M.D., INC.; RUZICS, ERVIN P.; PRATT, LARRY S.; PRATT, TRACEY E. ON 04/10/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11766761 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11590978.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11766761 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11590978.

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY PRATT, LARRY S.; PRATT, TRACEY E. ON 04/08/2015

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY PRATT, LARRY S.; PRATT, TRACEY E. ON 04/08/2015

MOTION IN LIMINE FILED BY PRATT, TRACEY E.; PRATT, LARRY S. ON 04/09/2015

MOTION IN LIMINE FILED BY PRATT, TRACEY E.; PRATT, LARRY S. ON 04/09/2015

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1208528 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1208528 REJECTED.

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY ASTON, EDWARD E.; EDWARD E. ASTON IV, M.D., INC.; EDWARD E. ASTON, IV, M.D. ON 11/26/2014

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY ASTON, EDWARD E.; EDWARD E. ASTON IV, M.D., INC.; EDWARD E. ASTON, IV, M.D. ON 11/26/2014

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY PRATT, TRACEY E.; PRATT, LARRY S. ON 11/17/2014

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY PRATT, TRACEY E.; PRATT, LARRY S. ON 11/17/2014

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WEIL, MARYA P.; ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE; ST. JOSEPH HEALTH SYSTEM ON 11/14/2014

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WEIL, MARYA P.; ST. JOSEPH HOSPITAL OF ORANGE; ST. JOSEPH HEALTH SYSTEM ON 11/14/2014

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 10/06/2014 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 10/06/2014 01:30:00 PM.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED BY TOLIA, VAISHAL MAHENDRA; THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 09/29/2014

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED BY TOLIA, VAISHAL MAHENDRA; THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 09/29/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 900.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11496896 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11320808.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 900.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11496896 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11320808.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PRATT, TRACEY E.; PRATT, LARRY S. ON 11/12/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PRATT, TRACEY E.; PRATT, LARRY S. ON 11/12/2013

NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTRODUCE DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE (COLLATERAL SOURCE PAYMENTS) FILED BY KAUPKE, CHARLES JEFFREY; NEPHROLOGY SPECIALISTS MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 10/23/2013

NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTRODUCE DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE (COLLATERAL SOURCE PAYMENTS) FILED BY KAUPKE, CHARLES JEFFREY; NEPHROLOGY SPECIALISTS MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 10/23/2013

374 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4505354 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3377211 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4493318 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS 01/07/2016 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY RUZICS, ERVIN P. ON 01/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3367549 RECEIVED ON 01/06/2016 11:53:23 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PRATT, TRACEY E.; PRATT, LARRY S. ON 01/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY PRATT, TRACEY E.; PRATT, LARRY S. ON 01/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4485480 RECEIVED ON 01/05/2016 05:19:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS 12/10/2015 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
595 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1118689 RECEIVED ON 10/16/2013 01:15:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 10/09/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 369187 RECEIVED ON 10/09/2013 01:50:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/01/2014 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GLASS, GEOFFREY ON 08/07/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11427465 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11251337.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PRATT, TRACEY E.; PRATT, LARRY S. ON 08/07/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PRATT, TRACEY E.; PRATT, LARRY S. ON 08/07/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY PRATT, TRACEY E.; PRATT, LARRY S. ON 08/07/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 460770 RECEIVED ON 08/07/2013 10:47:25 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.