This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/15/2018 at 03:39:38 (UTC).

TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT VS. JACK GARLAND

Case Summary

On 03/10/2016 TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against JACK GARLAND. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT

Defendant

JACK GARLAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN SCHLANGER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT ON 03/10/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT ON 03/10/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT ON 03/10/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT ON 03/10/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT ON 03/10/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT ON 03/10/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 169 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 385.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11935003 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11759188.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 169 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 385.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11935003 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11759188.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (& CLERK'S JUDGMENT) FILED BY TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT; GARLAND, JACK ON 03/28/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (& CLERK'S JUDGMENT) FILED BY TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT; GARLAND, JACK ON 03/28/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT; GARLAND, JACK ON 03/28/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT; GARLAND, JACK ON 03/28/2016

WRIT (ISSUED 03/28/16) RECEIVED ON 03/28/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 03/28/16) RECEIVED ON 03/28/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT; GARLAND, JACK ON 03/28/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT; GARLAND, JACK ON 03/28/2016

JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED 03/28/16) RECEIVED ON 03/28/2016.

JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED 03/28/16) RECEIVED ON 03/28/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11942631 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11766806.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11942631 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11766806.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT ON 04/18/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT ON 04/18/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT ON 04/18/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11942631 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11766806.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED 03/28/16) RECEIVED ON 03/28/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT; GARLAND, JACK ON 03/28/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (ISSUED 03/28/16) RECEIVED ON 03/28/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT; GARLAND, JACK ON 03/28/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (& CLERK'S JUDGMENT) FILED BY TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT; GARLAND, JACK ON 03/28/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4523863 RECEIVED ON 03/27/2016 04:10:41 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 169 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 385.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11935003 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11759188.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT ON 03/10/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT ON 03/10/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY TOWN AND COUNTRY MANAGEMENT ON 03/10/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4515995 RECEIVED ON 03/10/2016 08:28:56 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOWN AND COUNTRY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHLANGER JOHN