This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 20:06:09 (UTC).

TONY NIKKHOO VS. LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 TONY NIKKHOO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TONY NIKKHOO

Defendant

LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 02/03/2022 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketTHE COURT TAKES THIS MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL CONTINUED TO 02/03/2022 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C4 PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 02/03/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL REASSIGNED TO C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 02/03/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 02/01/2022 08:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/31/2022; Filing Party: LOYA CASUALTY INSURAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31102857 RECEIVED ON 01/02/2022 10:08:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY NIKKHOO, TONY ON 01/03/2022; Filing Party: NIKKHOO, TONY ON 01/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 02/01/2022 AT 08:00:00 AM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY EFFICIENTLEGALSUPPORT FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12979893 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12807826.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21096818 RECEIVED ON 12/06/2021 06:44:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY NIKKHOO, TONY ON 12/06/2021; Filing Party: NIKKHOO, TONY ON 12/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant