This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:28:57 (UTC).

TONY CUMBY VS. ENTRATA, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 TONY CUMBY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ENTRATA, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CONNIE MERIWETHER

TONY CUMBY

Defendants

FPI MANAGEMENT INC.

ENTRATA, INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2016
  • EXHIBITS HAVE BEEN DESTROYED PURSUANT TO CCP 1952.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS HELD PURSUANT TO CCP 1952.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/03/2016 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N15 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL REASSIGNED TO N15 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER ON 05/03/2016 AT 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 05/03/2016 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • THE COURT TAKES THIS MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY CUMBY, TONY; MERIWETHER, CONNIE ON 04/29/2016; Filing Party: CUMBY, TONY; MERIWETHER, CONNIE ON 04/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY CUMBY, TONY; MERIWETHER, CONNIE ON 04/20/2016; Filing Party: CUMBY, TONY; MERIWETHER, CONNIE ON 04/20/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 03 - SMALL CLAIMS $1,500 OR LESS IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927328 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751553.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CUMBY, TONY REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY CUMBY, TONY ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: CUMBY, TONY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/03/2016 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY CUMBY, TONY; MERIWETHER, CONNIE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: CUMBY, TONY; MERIWETHER, CONNIE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.