This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:48:44 (UTC).

TONY BASKHAROON VS. TUSTIN REDHILL CENTER, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 TONY BASKHAROON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TUSTIN REDHILL CENTER, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TONY BASKHAROON

MIRANDA BASKHAROON

Defendants

TUSTIN REDHILL CENTER, LLC

BEARBOWER INSURANCE SERVICES, LLC

TIMON INVESTMENT LLC

SUMMIT TEAM, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MERLIN LAW GROUP

Defendant Attorneys

EVANS LLP

LAW OFFICES OF SEAN T. MCGEE

YOKA & SMITH, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE) FILED BY TIMON INVESTMENT LLC; SUMMIT TEAM, INC. ON 12/05/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE) FILED BY TIMON INVESTMENT LLC; SUMMIT TEAM, INC. ON 12/05/2017

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY BASKHAROON, MIRANDA ON 10/23/2017

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY BASKHAROON, MIRANDA ON 10/23/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3615174 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3615174 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12269993 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12093722.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12269993 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12093722.

NOTICE - OTHER (ENTRY OF ORDER) FILED BY TIMON INVESTMENT LLC ON 03/13/2017

NOTICE - OTHER (ENTRY OF ORDER) FILED BY TIMON INVESTMENT LLC ON 03/13/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4793760 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4793760 REJECTED.

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY TIMON INVESTMENT LLC; SUMMIT TEAM, INC. ON 10/04/2017

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY TIMON INVESTMENT LLC; SUMMIT TEAM, INC. ON 10/04/2017

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY BASKHAROON, TONY ON 07/21/2016

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY BASKHAROON, TONY ON 07/21/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/08/2016 02:05:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/08/2016 02:05:00 PM.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/04/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/04/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12236422 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12060102.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12236422 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12060102.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927257 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751482.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927257 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751482.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/05/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/05/2017

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (FORM, SET ONE) FILED BY TIMON INVESTMENT LLC; SUMMIT TEAM, INC. ON 12/07/2017

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (FORM, SET ONE) FILED BY TIMON INVESTMENT LLC; SUMMIT TEAM, INC. ON 12/07/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11988651 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11812742.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11988651 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11812742.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3607666 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3607666 REJECTED.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/03/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/03/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY BASKHAROON, TONY; BASKHAROON, MIRANDA ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY BASKHAROON, TONY; BASKHAROON, MIRANDA ON 02/26/2016

95 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4805234 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (RE MSJ) FILED BY SUMMIT TEAM, INC.; TIMON INVESTMENT LLC ON 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3621830 RECEIVED ON 01/02/2018 03:41:14 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3615174 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3614318 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3614317 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3607666 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3593966 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4787502 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4793760 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
155 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2016
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER C.C.P. 170.6 AS TO THE HONORABLE DAVID R. CHAFFEE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO RONALD BAUER EFFECTIVE 03/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (JUDGE DAVID CHAFFEE) FILED BY BASKHAROON, MIRANDA; BASKHAROON, TONY ON 03/04/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3387937 RECEIVED ON 03/04/2016 02:30:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CHAFFEE, DAVID ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927257 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751482.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BASKHAROON, TONY; BASKHAROON, MIRANDA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BASKHAROON, TONY; BASKHAROON, MIRANDA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY BASKHAROON, TONY; BASKHAROON, MIRANDA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509461 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 10:13:10 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.