This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 00:15:22 (UTC).

TODD ROBERT CUNNINGHAM VS. ECS HOME INSPECTIONS

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 TODD ROBERT CUNNINGHAM filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ECS HOME INSPECTIONS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TODD ROBERT CUNNINGHAM

ROSABELLE LOAN NGUYEN-CUNNINGHAM

Defendant

ECS HOME INSPECTIONS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2014
  • PURSUANT TO CCP 1952 EXHIBITS HAVE BEEN DESTROYED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY ECS HOME INSPECTIONS ON 12/30/2013; Filing Party: ECS HOME INSPECTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY NGUYEN-CUNNINGHAM, ROSABELLE LOAN ON 12/30/2013; Filing Party: NGUYEN-CUNNINGHAM, RO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 12/30/2013 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • THE COURT TAKES THIS MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/30/2013 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO VACATE 12/30/2013 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • THE SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 12/30/2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT H10.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2013
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 10/03/2013 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • CORRESPONDENCE FILED BY ECS HOME INSPECTIONS ON 09/30/2013; Filing Party: ECS HOME INSPECTIONS ON 09/30/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY CUNNINGHAM, TODD ROBERT; NGUYEN-CUNNINGHAM, ROSABELLE LOAN ON 09/16/2013; Filing Party: CUNNINGHAM, TODD ROBERT; NGUYEN-CUNNINGHAM, ROSABELLE LOAN ON 09/16/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • CORRESPONDENCE SUBMITTED BY ECS HOME INSPECTIONS REJECTED ON 09/10/2013.; Filing Party: DENCE SUBMITTED BY ECS HOME INSPECTIONS REJECTED ON 09/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/03/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/10/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH WAS VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/10/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11429809 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11253681.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 462128 RECEIVED ON 08/10/2013 06:46:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY CUNNINGHAM, TODD ROBERT; NGUYEN-CUNNINGHAM, ROSABELLE LOAN ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: CUNNINGHAM, TODD ROBERT; NGUYEN-CUNNINGHAM, ROSABELLE LOAN ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less