This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:32:26 (UTC).

TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC VS. FRANK LAMSON

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FRANK LAMSON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC

Defendants

MICHELLE NARANJO

FRANK LAMSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 10/10/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/23/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/23/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 10/24/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 10/24/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 10/24/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 10/24/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 10/24/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 10/24/2017

JUDGMENT FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/25/2018

JUDGMENT FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/25/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3628316 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3628316 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234222 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057901.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234222 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057901.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12244681 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12068422.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12244681 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12068422.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/30/17) RECEIVED ON 10/24/2017.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/30/17) RECEIVED ON 10/24/2017.

COMPLAINT FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 10/10/2017

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/30/17) RECEIVED ON 10/24/2017.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/30/17) RECEIVED ON 10/24/2017.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/23/2018

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/23/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/23/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/23/2018

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

WRIT (ISSUED ON 10/30/17) RECEIVED ON 10/24/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 10/30/17) RECEIVED ON 10/24/2017.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 10/24/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 10/24/2017

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2018
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 01/23/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3628719 RECEIVED ON 01/23/2018 12:14:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3628316 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 11/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/30/17) RECEIVED ON 10/24/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/30/17) RECEIVED ON 10/24/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2605755 RECEIVED ON 10/24/2017 02:50:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234222 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057901.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY TN INVESTMENTS PROPERTIES, LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2601218 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 05:48:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.