This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:29:01 (UTC).

TIMOTHY RYAN MCKEE VS. HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 TIMOTHY RYAN MCKEE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOME DEPOT U S A , INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIMOTHY RYAN MCKEE

Defendants

U.S. REMODELERS, INC.

HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/02/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH WAS VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MCKEE, TIMOTHY RYAN ON 05/23/2016; Filing Party: MCKEE, TIMOTHY RYAN ON 05/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK FILED BY MCKEE, TIMOTHY RYAN ON 04/25/2016; Filing Party: MCKEE, TIMOTHY RYAN ON 04/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK FILED BY MCKEE, TIMOTHY RYAN ON 04/25/2016; Filing Party: MCKEE, TIMOTHY RYAN ON 04/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY MCKEE, TIMOTHY RYAN FOR 07 - CERTIFIED MAIL - SERVICE BY CLERK, 07 - CERTIFIED MAIL - SERVICE BY CLERK IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11953079 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11777244.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/15/2016; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • CERTIFIED MAIL STATEMENT FILED BY MCKEE, TIMOTHY RYAN ON 04/15/2016; Filing Party: MCKEE, TIMOTHY RYAN ON 04/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • CERTIFIED MAIL STATEMENT FILED BY MCKEE, TIMOTHY RYAN ON 04/15/2016; Filing Party: MCKEE, TIMOTHY RYAN ON 04/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/15/2016; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/02/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DOE, JOHN FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927026 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751251.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1306900 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 09:41:12 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY MCKEE, TIMOTHY RYAN ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MCKEE, TIMOTHY RYAN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.