This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:31:48 (UTC).

TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC VS. MANA CONCEPTS, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MANA CONCEPTS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC

Defendants

DAWN APPLEGATE

LORETTA GRIFFITHS

SCOTT GRIFFITHS

MANA CONCEPTS, INC.

MARK APPLEGATE

RON LOVE

MANA CONCEPTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DIANNE LOVE

MANA CONCEPTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEWLEY LASSLEBEN & MILLER, LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 11/02/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 11/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 03/29/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 03/29/2018

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 03/29/2018

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 03/29/2018

CASE REASSIGNED TO DAVID CHAFFEE EFFECTIVE 03/28/2018.

CASE REASSIGNED TO DAVID CHAFFEE EFFECTIVE 03/28/2018.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 11/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 11/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 03/29/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 03/29/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12247574 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12071310.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12247574 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12071310.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 03/29/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 03/29/2018

WRIT (ISSUED 11/3/17) RECEIVED ON 11/02/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED 11/3/17) RECEIVED ON 11/02/2017.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 03/29/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 03/29/2018

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 11/02/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 11/02/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 169 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 385.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234191 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057870.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 169 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 385.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234191 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057870.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 10/10/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 01/19/2018

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 01/19/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 03/29/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 03/29/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 10/10/2017

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 01/24/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 01/24/2018.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2629157 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2629157 REJECTED.

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1483713 RECEIVED ON 03/29/2018 12:14:38 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1483589 RECEIVED ON 03/29/2018 09:46:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO DAVID CHAFFEE EFFECTIVE 03/28/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 01/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (TO PAY OR QUIT) FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4783711 RECEIVED ON 11/02/2017 10:02:27 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 169 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 385.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234191 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057870.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY TICAD RETAIL PROPERTIES HOLDINGS LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3595941 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 03:37:28 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.