This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:32:47 (UTC).

THOMAS BRANNON VS. FRANK GESTOSO

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 THOMAS BRANNON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FRANK GESTOSO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS BRANNON

Defendants

ESTRELLITA GESTOSO

FRANK GESTOSO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPLINTER & THAI, LLP

Defendant Attorney

Ford Walker Haggerty & Behar

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12318563 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12142333.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12318563 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12142333.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BRANNON, THOMAS ON 03/15/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BRANNON, THOMAS ON 03/15/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BRANNON, THOMAS ON 03/15/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BRANNON, THOMAS ON 03/15/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BRANNON, THOMAS ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BRANNON, THOMAS ON 10/10/2017

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GESTOSO, ESTRELLITA; GESTOSO, FRANK ON 05/08/2018

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GESTOSO, ESTRELLITA; GESTOSO, FRANK ON 05/08/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BRANNON, THOMAS ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BRANNON, THOMAS ON 10/10/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GESTOSO, ESTRELLITA; GESTOSO, FRANK ON 05/09/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GESTOSO, ESTRELLITA; GESTOSO, FRANK ON 05/09/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12333238 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12156968.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12333238 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12156968.

COMPLAINT FILED BY BRANNON, THOMAS ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY BRANNON, THOMAS ON 10/10/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234226 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057905.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234226 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057905.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BRANNON, THOMAS ON 03/19/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BRANNON, THOMAS ON 03/19/2018

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY GESTOSO, ESTRELLITA; GESTOSO, FRANK ON 05/08/2018

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY GESTOSO, ESTRELLITA; GESTOSO, FRANK ON 05/08/2018

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CHAFFEE, DAVID ON 10/10/2017.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CHAFFEE, DAVID ON 10/10/2017.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/10/2018 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/10/2018 08:30:00 AM.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY BRANNON, THOMAS ON 04/10/2018

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY BRANNON, THOMAS ON 04/10/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/10/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/10/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/10/2018 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/10/2018 08:30:00 AM.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GESTOSO, ESTRELLITA; GESTOSO, FRANK ON 05/08/2018

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GESTOSO, ESTRELLITA; GESTOSO, FRANK ON 05/08/2018

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2018
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BRANNON, THOMAS ON 07/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2694746 RECEIVED ON 07/25/2018 09:03:42 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/10/2018 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 12/14/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C-20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • THE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/22/2019 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C-20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/14/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 01/22/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GESTOSO, ESTRELLITA; GESTOSO, FRANK ON 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BRANNON, THOMAS ON 03/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BRANNON, THOMAS ON 03/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2650627 RECEIVED ON 03/15/2018 12:25:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/10/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CHAFFEE, DAVID ON 10/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234226 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057905.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BRANNON, THOMAS ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BRANNON, THOMAS ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY BRANNON, THOMAS ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3595982 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 04:24:52 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.