Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/16/2020 at 02:12:40 (UTC).

THERESA LOUIS VS. HETT INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/25/2017 THERESA LOUIS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HETT INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THERESA LOUIS

JEREMY WITTMAN

Defendant

HETT INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER MEDIATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY HETT INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC ON 07/24/2017; Filing Party: HETT INVESTMENT GROUP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketSTIPULATION/ORDER - OTHER (MEDIATION STIPULATION) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/24/2017; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketMOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT GRANTED. JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 06/12/2017 AGAINST THERESA LOUIS, JEREMY WITTMAN, HETT INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT VACATED. TRIAL TO BE HEARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO VACATE 07/24/2017 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketDISPOSITION FOR WITTMAN, JEREMY ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketDISPOSITION FOR LOUIS, THERESA ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketDISPOSITION FOR HETT INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketMEDIATION WAS SUCCESSFUL.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 06/12/2017 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1386048 RECEIVED ON 05/19/2017 02:47:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WITTMAN, JEREMY; LOUIS, THERESA ON 05/19/2017; Filing Party: WITTMAN, JEREMY; LOUIS, THERESA ON 05/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/12/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12098239 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11922201.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2525951 RECEIVED ON 01/25/2017 05:31:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY LOUIS, THERESA; WITTMAN, JEREMY ON 01/25/2017; Filing Party: LOUIS, THERESA; WITTMAN, JEREMY ON 01/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HETT INVESTMENT GROUP LLC is a litigant