This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:47:16 (UTC).

THERESA LISA ANN MOYER VS. TIMOTHY WAYNE GREEN

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 THERESA LISA ANN MOYER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TIMOTHY WAYNE GREEN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THERESA LISA ANN MOYER

Defendant

TIMOTHY WAYNE GREEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RIENTS & LONNER

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL MAGUIRE & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOYER, THERESA LISA ANN ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOYER, THERESA LISA ANN ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOYER, THERESA LISA ANN ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOYER, THERESA LISA ANN ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927675 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751900.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927675 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751900.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GREEN, TIMOTHY WAYNE ON 03/25/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GREEN, TIMOTHY WAYNE ON 03/25/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GREEN, TIMOTHY WAYNE ON 03/25/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GREEN, TIMOTHY WAYNE ON 03/25/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/23/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/23/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

COMPLAINT FILED BY MOYER, THERESA LISA ANN ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY MOYER, THERESA LISA ANN ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MOYER, THERESA LISA ANN ON 09/15/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MOYER, THERESA LISA ANN ON 09/15/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 520.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11941994 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11766169.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 520.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11941994 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11766169.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MOYER, THERESA LISA ANN ON 03/11/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MOYER, THERESA LISA ANN ON 03/11/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MOYER, THERESA LISA ANN ON 09/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2493634 RECEIVED ON 09/15/2016 07:35:25 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/23/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 520.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11941994 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11766169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GREEN, TIMOTHY WAYNE ON 03/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GREEN, TIMOTHY WAYNE ON 03/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3395509 RECEIVED ON 03/25/2016 08:32:51 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MOYER, THERESA LISA ANN ON 03/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1309494 RECEIVED ON 03/11/2016 01:42:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927675 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751900.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOYER, THERESA LISA ANN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOYER, THERESA LISA ANN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MOYER, THERESA LISA ANN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385244 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 12:51:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.