This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 02:44:11 (UTC).

THEODORE MARTIN VS. MICHAEL ZELLMER

Case Summary

On 05/24/2019 THEODORE MARTIN filed an Other lawsuit against MICHAEL ZELLMER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Theodore Martin

Defendants

Michael Zellmer

J&M General Contractors, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Newmeyer & Dillion LLP

Defendant Attorney

Steven A. Fink

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY MARTIN, THEODORE ON 05/24/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY MARTIN, THEODORE ON 05/24/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARTIN, THEODORE ON 05/24/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARTIN, THEODORE ON 05/24/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12561500 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12385379.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12561500 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12385379.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARGINES, CHARLES ON 05/24/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARGINES, CHARLES ON 05/24/2019.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARTIN, THEODORE ON 05/31/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARTIN, THEODORE ON 05/31/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MARTIN, THEODORE ON 06/10/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MARTIN, THEODORE ON 06/10/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/27/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/27/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MARTIN, THEODORE ON 07/01/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MARTIN, THEODORE ON 07/01/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ZELLMER, MICHAEL ON 07/29/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ZELLMER, MICHAEL ON 07/29/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12593820 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12417879.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12593820 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12417879.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MARTIN, THEODORE ON 07/15/2019

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MARTIN, THEODORE ON 07/15/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MARTIN, THEODORE ON 08/13/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MARTIN, THEODORE ON 08/13/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MARTIN, THEODORE ON 08/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3823024 RECEIVED ON 08/13/2019 12:59:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MARTIN, THEODORE ON 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2815518 RECEIVED ON 07/15/2019 11:05:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12593820 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12417879.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ZELLMER, MICHAEL ON 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2820443 RECEIVED ON 07/27/2019 11:53:31 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MARTIN, THEODORE ON 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1639404 RECEIVED ON 07/01/2019 08:50:01 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/27/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MARTIN, THEODORE ON 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2803726 RECEIVED ON 06/10/2019 02:41:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARTIN, THEODORE ON 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4975480 RECEIVED ON 05/31/2019 03:03:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARGINES, CHARLES ON 05/24/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12561500 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12385379.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARTIN, THEODORE ON 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MARTIN, THEODORE ON 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4973288 RECEIVED ON 05/24/2019 12:35:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less