This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/12/2019 at 02:09:08 (UTC).

THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC VS. NICHOLAS HOLDINGS, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/12/2018 THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NICHOLAS HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC

Defendant

NICHOLAS HOLDINGS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF ANGIRA J. PATEL

Hollins & Associates

Defendant Attorney

BROWER LAW GROUP, APC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY NICHOLAS HOLDINGS, LLC ON 07/03/2019

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY NICHOLAS HOLDINGS, LLC ON 07/03/2019

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 03/11/2019

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 03/11/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/19/2018 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/19/2018 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 10/19/2018

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 10/19/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12438267 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12261946.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12438267 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12261946.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 10/18/2018

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 10/18/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NICHOLAS HOLDINGS, LLC ON 10/09/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NICHOLAS HOLDINGS, LLC ON 10/09/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 09/21/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 09/21/2018

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 09/10/2018

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 09/10/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12405781 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12229511.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12405781 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12229511.

CLERK'S APPLICATION AND ORDER RE: CORRECTION OF ERROR. VACATE DEFAULT.

CLERK'S APPLICATION AND ORDER RE: CORRECTION OF ERROR. VACATE DEFAULT.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 08/09/2018

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 08/09/2018

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 08/09/2018

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 08/09/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/19/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/19/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE REASSIGNED TO LAYNE MELZER EFFECTIVE 07/30/2018.

CASE REASSIGNED TO LAYNE MELZER EFFECTIVE 07/30/2018.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 06/12/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 06/12/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 06/12/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 06/12/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 06/12/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 06/12/2018

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY NICHOLAS HOLDINGS, LLC ON 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4987109 RECEIVED ON 07/03/2019 02:03:10 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 03/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3768386 RECEIVED ON 03/11/2019 02:05:41 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY NICHOLAS HOLDINGS, LLC ON 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1586656 RECEIVED ON 01/31/2019 05:24:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/19/2018 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/22/2019 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • THE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/06/2020 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/22/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/19/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO LAYNE MELZER EFFECTIVE 07/30/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 07/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1517693 RECEIVED ON 07/10/2018 12:12:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 06/12/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12368565 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12192338.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC ON 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1508650 RECEIVED ON 06/12/2018 12:35:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP INC. is a litigant