Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/25/2020 at 06:43:46 (UTC).

THE WOLF FIRM, A LAW CORPORATION VS. GREGORY D. WANLASS

Case Summary

On 08/12/2020 THE WOLF FIRM, A LAW CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GREGORY D WANLASS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Wolf Firm, A Law Corporation

Defendants

Gregory D. Wanlass

John Fox

Asset Recovery, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Wolf Firm, A Law Corporation

 

Court Documents

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/01/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/01/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/25/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/25/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY THE WOLF FIRM, A LAW CORPORATION ON 08/20/2020

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY THE WOLF FIRM, A LAW CORPORATION ON 08/20/2020

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY THE WOLF FIRM, A LAW CORPORATION ON 08/20/2020

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY THE WOLF FIRM, A LAW CORPORATION ON 08/20/2020

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 08/12/2020.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 08/12/2020.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12767759 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12594252.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12767759 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12594252.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE WOLF FIRM, A LAW CORPORATION ON 08/12/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE WOLF FIRM, A LAW CORPORATION ON 08/12/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE WOLF FIRM, A LAW CORPORATION ON 08/12/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE WOLF FIRM, A LAW CORPORATION ON 08/12/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE WOLF FIRM, A LAW CORPORATION ON 08/12/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE WOLF FIRM, A LAW CORPORATION ON 08/12/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: HOWARD; Department: C18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HOWARD; Department: C18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/01/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/25/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY THE WOLF FIRM, A LAW CORPORATION ON 08/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY THE WOLF FIRM, A LAW CORPORATION ON 08/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3929686 RECEIVED ON 08/20/2020 09:31:18 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12767759 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12594252.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2930913 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2020 04:11:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 08/12/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE WOLF FIRM, A LAW CORPORATION ON 08/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE WOLF FIRM, A LAW CORPORATION ON 08/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY THE WOLF FIRM, A LAW CORPORATION ON 08/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASSET RECOVERY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE WOLF FIRM is a litigant