This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/12/2022 at 06:42:39 (UTC).

THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION VS. HUDSON EXCESS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HUDSON EXCESS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Amtrust International Insurance, LTD.

Associated Industries Insurance Company

Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company

Berkley Assurance Company

Colony Insurance Company

Financial Pacific Insurance Company

First Specialty Insurance Company

Gemini Insurance Company

Gotham Insurance Company

Houston Specialty Insurance Company

Hudson Excess Insurance Company

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

Kinsale Insurance Company

Mt. Hawley Insurance Company

Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company

Old Republic Insurance Company

Rockingham Insurance Company

Scottsdale Insurance Company

Starr Indemnity & Liability Company

Steadfast Insurance Company

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Hirsch Closson

Walsh McKean Furcolo LLP

Grimm Vranjes Greer Stephan & Bridgman LLP

Robertson & Associates, APC

Buscemi Hallett LLP

Other Attorneys

THE AGUILERA LAW GROUP, APLC

CNA Coverage Litigation Group

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 2,870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13006452 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12834404.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 2,870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13006452 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12834404.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE, LTD.; ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/09/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE, LTD.; ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/09/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13004688 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12832640.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13004688 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12832640.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION ON 02/07/2022

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION ON 02/07/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/04/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/04/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION ON 02/02/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION ON 02/02/2022

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31115373 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31115373 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13002294 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12830213.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13002294 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12830213.

NOTICE - OTHER (POSTING COMPLEX FEE) FILED BY VALLEY FORGE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/01/2022

NOTICE - OTHER (POSTING COMPLEX FEE) FILED BY VALLEY FORGE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/01/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13002114 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12830033.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13002114 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12830033.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION ON 02/01/2022.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION ON 02/01/2022.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC. FOR 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13001354 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12829273.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC. FOR 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13001354 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12829273.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13000579 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12828498.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13000579 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12828498.

NOTICE - OTHER (POSTING COMPLEX FEE) FILED BY GOTHAM INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/28/2022

NOTICE - OTHER (POSTING COMPLEX FEE) FILED BY GOTHAM INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/28/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13000357 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12828276.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13000357 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12828276.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ROCKINGHAM INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/27/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ROCKINGHAM INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/27/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ROCKINGHAM INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/27/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ROCKINGHAM INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/27/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13000197 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12828116.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13000197 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12828116.

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: CLASTER; Department: CX104

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 2,870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13006452 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12834404.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE, LTD.; ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21120986 RECEIVED ON 02/09/2022 03:10:52 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13004688 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12832640.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION ON 02/07/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1948228 RECEIVED ON 02/04/2022 12:52:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION ON 02/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31115437 RECEIVED ON 02/02/2022 02:32:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
98 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION ON 12/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41276381 RECEIVED ON 12/16/2021 03:10:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1924901 RECEIVED ON 12/03/2021 11:23:41 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION ON 12/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12977888 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12805807.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1923462 RECEIVED ON 11/30/2021 03:05:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CLASTER, WILLIAM ON 11/30/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 11/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION ON 11/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION ON 11/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hudson Excess Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where BERKLEY ASSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ATEGRITY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ROCKINGHAM INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant