This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/28/2021 at 18:04:31 (UTC).

THE TONY ROTA MONEY PURCHASE PENSION PLAN VS. WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/23/2016 THE TONY ROTA MONEY PURCHASE PENSION PLAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE TONY ROTA MONEY PURCHASE PENSION PLAN

Defendant

WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LYTTON WILLIAMS MESSINA & HANKIN, LLP

ATTLESEY STORM LLP

Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL F SITZER

SITZER LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY THE TONY ROTA MONEY PURCHASE PENSION PLAN ON 03/21/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY THE TONY ROTA MONEY PURCHASE PENSION PLAN ON 03/21/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 02/16/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 02/16/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 02/09/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 02/09/2017 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - MOTION/NOTICE TO CONTINUE HEARING OR CMC IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12105616 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11929524.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - MOTION/NOTICE TO CONTINUE HEARING OR CMC IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12105616 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11929524.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ON 02/09/2017

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ON 02/09/2017

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC.; WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ON 02/08/2017

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC.; WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ON 02/08/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY THE TONY ROTA MONEY PURCHASE PENSION PLAN ON 02/08/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY THE TONY ROTA MONEY PURCHASE PENSION PLAN ON 02/08/2017

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE TONY ROTA MONEY PURCHASE PENSION PLAN ON 01/25/2017

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE TONY ROTA MONEY PURCHASE PENSION PLAN ON 01/25/2017

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC.; WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ON 01/18/2017

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC.; WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ON 01/18/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 01/09/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 01/09/2017 09:00:00 AM.

AMENDED ANSWER FILED BY WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC.; WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ON 01/06/2017

AMENDED ANSWER FILED BY WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC.; WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ON 01/06/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ON 01/06/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ON 01/06/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ON 01/05/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ON 01/05/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ON 01/05/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ON 01/05/2017

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ON 01/05/2017

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ON 01/05/2017

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ON 12/27/2016

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ON 12/27/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY THE TONY ROTA MONEY PURCHASE PENSION PLAN ON 12/21/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY THE TONY ROTA MONEY PURCHASE PENSION PLAN ON 12/21/2016

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY THE TONY ROTA MONEY PURCHASE PENSION PLAN ON 12/21/2016

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY THE TONY ROTA MONEY PURCHASE PENSION PLAN ON 12/21/2016

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3524798 RECEIVED ON 03/21/2017 05:27:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY THE TONY ROTA MONEY PURCHASE PENSION PLAN ON 03/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 02/16/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE CONTINUED TO 04/04/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 04/04/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 02/09/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE CONTINUED TO 02/16/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 02/16/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. ON 05/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/07/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY THE TONY ROTA MONEY PURCHASE PENSION PLAN ON 04/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4526436 RECEIVED ON 03/31/2016 03:04:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11941198 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11765382.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3394569 RECEIVED ON 03/23/2016 01:30:47 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HORN, FREDERICK ON 03/23/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE TONY ROTA MONEY PURCHASE PENSION PLAN ON 03/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE TONY ROTA MONEY PURCHASE PENSION PLAN ON 03/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY THE TONY ROTA MONEY PURCHASE PENSION PLAN ON 03/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Windstone Health Services, Inc. is a litigant