This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/25/2021 at 06:55:29 (UTC).

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA VS. HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Regents of the University of California

Defendants

Desert Oasis Health Care

Affiliated Doctors of Orange County Medical Group, Inc.

Victor Valley Medical Group

High Desert Medical Corporation

Lakeside Medical Group, Inc.

Heritage Provider Network

Regal Medical Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephenson, Acquisto & Colman

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 11/12/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 11/12/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 11/12/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 11/12/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 11/12/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 11/12/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/02/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/02/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/02/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/02/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/02/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/02/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/02/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/02/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/02/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/02/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/02/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/02/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/02/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/02/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO JOHN GASTELUM EFFECTIVE 12/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCASE CONSOLIDATED ON 12/11/2020. 30-2020-01141529-CU-CO-CJC IS DESIGNATED THE LEAD CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 12/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1791302 RECEIVED ON 12/02/2020 10:29:35 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER ZELTZER, NANCY ON 11/12/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 11/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 11/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 11/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41132024 RECEIVED ON 11/11/2020 03:12:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lakeside Medical Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DESERT OASIS HEALTHCARE is a litigant

Latest cases where AFFILIATED DOCTORS OF ORANGE COUNTY MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK INC. is a litigant