This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/17/2018 at 02:37:12 (UTC).

THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. VS. SAAD ALSALLUM

Case Summary

On 05/25/2016 THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SAAD ALSALLUM. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS.

Defendant

SAAD ALSALLUM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE DURINGER LAW GROUP PLC.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 05/25/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 05/25/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 05/25/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 05/25/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 05/25/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 05/25/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11973688 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11797848.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11973688 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11797848.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 06/07/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 06/07/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 06/07/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 06/07/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 06/13/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 06/13/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 06/13/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 06/13/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 06/13/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 06/13/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED 06/14/2016) RECEIVED ON 06/13/2016.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED 06/14/2016) RECEIVED ON 06/13/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 06/13/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 06/13/2016

WRIT (ISSUED ON 06/14/2016) RECEIVED ON 06/13/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 06/14/2016) RECEIVED ON 06/13/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11982801 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11806886.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11982801 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11806886.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 07/05/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 07/05/2016

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 07/05/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11982801 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11806886.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (ISSUED ON 06/14/2016) RECEIVED ON 06/13/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 06/13/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED 06/14/2016) RECEIVED ON 06/13/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 06/13/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 06/13/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 06/13/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4560859 RECEIVED ON 06/13/2016 09:04:20 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 06/07/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 06/07/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2468409 RECEIVED ON 06/07/2016 08:58:20 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11973688 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11797848.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 05/25/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 05/25/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY THE POINTE AT COLLEGE PLACE APTS. ON 05/25/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4552963 RECEIVED ON 05/25/2016 04:11:52 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less