This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 07:53:49 (UTC).

THE PLAZA-IRVINE OWNERS ASSOCIATION VS. JWC CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/11/2018 THE PLAZA-IRVINE OWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JWC CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE PLAZA-IRVINE OWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Others

BENCHMARK STONEWORKS INCORPORATED

INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

JWC CONSTRUCTION, INC.

KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPA

HENRY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEAUMONT TASHJIAN

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Other Attorneys

JEFFERY & GROSFELD, LLP

BYRON & EDWARDS, APC

COLLINS COLLINS MUIR & STEWART LLP

Law Office of Karl S. Thurmond

 

Court Documents

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (ROE 1) FILED BY BENCHMARK STONEWORKS INCORPORATED ON 07/12/2019

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (ROE 1) FILED BY BENCHMARK STONEWORKS INCORPORATED ON 07/12/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 38 - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12584999 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12409045.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 38 - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12584999 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12409045.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/28/2019

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/28/2019

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/28/2019

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/28/2019

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/28/2019

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/28/2019

DOCUMENT - OTHER (COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT) FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/28/2019

DOCUMENT - OTHER (COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT) FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/28/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/28/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/28/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/28/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/28/2019

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/28/2019

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/28/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (ON CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY BENCHMARK STONEWORKS INCORPORATED ON 02/13/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (ON CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY BENCHMARK STONEWORKS INCORPORATED ON 02/13/2019

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY BENCHMARK STONEWORKS INCORPORATED ON 02/13/2019

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY BENCHMARK STONEWORKS INCORPORATED ON 02/13/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BENCHMARK STONEWORKS INCORPORATED ON 02/13/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BENCHMARK STONEWORKS INCORPORATED ON 02/13/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 01/29/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 01/29/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12489045 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12312744.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12489045 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12312744.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL) FILED BY BENCHMARK STONEWORKS INCORPORATED ON 01/14/2019

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL) FILED BY BENCHMARK STONEWORKS INCORPORATED ON 01/14/2019

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY THE PLAZA-IRVINE OWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 01/14/2019

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY THE PLAZA-IRVINE OWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 01/14/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 01/11/2019 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 01/11/2019 10:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12480555 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12304226.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12480555 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12304226.

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (ROE 1) FILED BY BENCHMARK STONEWORKS INCORPORATED ON 07/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4989892 RECEIVED ON 07/12/2019 01:13:38 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION SCHEDULED FOR 09/13/2019 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 38 - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12584999 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12409045.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/28/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/28/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/28/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT - OTHER (COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT) FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/28/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/28/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY KNITTER PARTNERS INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/28/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY THE PLAZA-IRVINE OWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 10/31/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY THE PLAZA-IRVINE OWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 10/31/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3725123 RECEIVED ON 10/31/2018 08:11:33 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 10/11/2018.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12434807 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12258466.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - OTHER FILED BY THE PLAZA-IRVINE OWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 10/11/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE PLAZA-IRVINE OWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 10/11/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE PLAZA-IRVINE OWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 10/11/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY THE PLAZA-IRVINE OWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 10/11/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4896256 RECEIVED ON 10/11/2018 12:39:20 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less