This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/09/2020 at 06:47:43 (UTC).

THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. VS. ROBIN COFFEY

Case Summary

On 12/26/2019 THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROBIN COFFEY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P.

Defendant

ROBIN COFFEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIFFANY DIANE STATON

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 214 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12705431 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12530536.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 214 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12705431 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12530536.

WRIT ISSUED ON 02/06/2020

WRIT ISSUED ON 02/06/2020

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 02/04/2020

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 02/04/2020

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 01/31/20) RECEIVED ON 01/30/2020.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 01/31/20) RECEIVED ON 01/30/2020.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 01/30/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 01/30/2020

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 01/30/2020

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 01/30/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 01/10/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 01/10/2020

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ORDER - OTHER (APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 01/06/2020

ORDER - OTHER (APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 01/06/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12685211 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12510150.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12685211 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12510150.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 01/03/2020.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 01/03/2020.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12681851 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12506725.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12681851 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12506725.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 12/26/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 12/26/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 12/26/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 12/26/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 12/26/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 12/26/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 03/05/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 214 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12705431 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12530536.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED ON 02/06/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1716360 RECEIVED ON 02/04/2020 01:04:16 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 02/04/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1714650 RECEIVED ON 01/30/2020 01:08:57 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 01/31/20) RECEIVED ON 01/30/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 01/30/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 01/06/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12685211 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12510150.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2876070 RECEIVED ON 01/03/2020 12:12:19 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 01/03/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12681851 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12506725.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 12/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 12/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY THE NEWPORTER APARTMENT COMPANY, L.P. ON 12/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41048780 RECEIVED ON 12/26/2019 12:46:51 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEWPORTER APARTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BYRNE & ASSOCIATES - TIFFANY DIANE STATON