This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/28/2022 at 07:55:01 (UTC).

THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC VS. MARINE LAYER, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARINE LAYER, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Irvine Company, LLC

Defendant

Marine Layer, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bewley Lassleben & Miller, LLP

Defendant Attorney

GOLDSTEIN, GELLMAN, MELBOSTAD, HARRIS & McSPARRAN, LLP

Other Attorneys

GOLDSTEIN, GELLMAN, MELBOSTAD, HARRIS

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 08/10/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 08/10/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 08/10/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 08/10/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 08/10/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 08/10/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12927605 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12755466.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12927605 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12755466.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/11/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/11/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 08/25/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 08/25/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MARINE LAYER, INC. ON 09/24/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MARINE LAYER, INC. ON 09/24/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12949070 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12776975.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12949070 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12776975.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MARINE LAYER, INC. ON 11/22/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MARINE LAYER, INC. ON 11/22/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 11/29/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 11/29/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 12/01/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 12/01/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21094660 RECEIVED ON 12/01/2021 08:35:37 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41268767 RECEIVED ON 11/29/2021 07:09:02 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 11/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MARINE LAYER, INC. ON 11/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41267267 RECEIVED ON 11/22/2021 01:23:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12949070 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12776975.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21069393 RECEIVED ON 09/24/2021 02:00:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MARINE LAYER, INC. ON 09/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31054969 RECEIVED ON 08/25/2021 02:24:28 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/11/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 08/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12927605 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12755466.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 08/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 08/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY, LLC ON 08/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31048835 RECEIVED ON 08/10/2021 11:23:20 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Irvine Company, LLC is a litigant