This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 09:37:09 (UTC).

THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS. 333 FINANCIAL INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/03/2017 THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against 333 FINANCIAL INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMI

Defendants

333 FINANCIAL INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

333 FINANCIAL INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GORDON & REES LLP

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 09/14/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 09/14/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12210996 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12034691.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12210996 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12034691.

WRIT (ISSUED 8/28/17) RECEIVED ON 08/25/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED 8/28/17) RECEIVED ON 08/25/2017.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/25/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/25/2017

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 8/28/17) RECEIVED ON 08/25/2017.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 8/28/17) RECEIVED ON 08/25/2017.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/25/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/25/2017

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/25/2017

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/25/2017

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 169 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 385.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12198248 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12021973.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 169 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 385.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12198248 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12021973.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/03/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/03/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/03/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/03/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/03/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/03/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12210996 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12034691.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 8/28/17) RECEIVED ON 08/25/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 8/28/17) RECEIVED ON 08/25/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3581037 RECEIVED ON 08/25/2017 03:31:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 169 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 385.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12198248 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12021973.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3573236 RECEIVED ON 08/03/2017 02:27:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less