This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 09:23:02 (UTC).

THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. VS. SARAH ALOMAR

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SARAH ALOMAR. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC.

Defendants

ABDULRAHMAN ALOMAR

SARAH ALOMAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/20/2017

JUDGMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/20/2017

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/13/2017.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/13/2017.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/13/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/13/2017

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/13/2017

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/13/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/13/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/13/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/27/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/27/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12090168 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11914151.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12090168 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11914151.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/12/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/12/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/12/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/12/2017

WRIT (ISSUED ON 01/12/17) RECEIVED ON 01/12/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 01/12/17) RECEIVED ON 01/12/2017.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 01/12/17) RECEIVED ON 01/12/2017.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 01/12/17) RECEIVED ON 01/12/2017.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/12/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/12/2017

APPLICATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 12/21/2016

APPLICATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 12/21/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12080906 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11904874.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12080906 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11904874.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12077595 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11901559.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12077595 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11901559.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 12/14/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 12/14/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 12/14/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 12/14/2016

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/13/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3521305 RECEIVED ON 03/13/2017 04:21:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12080906 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11904874.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 12/21/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4652257 RECEIVED ON 12/21/2016 11:19:28 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12077595 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11901559.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 12/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 12/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 12/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3490178 RECEIVED ON 12/14/2016 06:41:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less