This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 08:32:24 (UTC).

THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. VS. RONNEY JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RONNEY JOHNSON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC.

THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITI

Defendant

RONNEY JOHNSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

WRIT ISSUED ON 07/19/2019

WRIT ISSUED ON 07/19/2019

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 09/14/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 09/14/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4765011 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4765011 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3583509 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3583509 REJECTED.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY JOHNSON, RONNEY ON 09/05/2017

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY JOHNSON, RONNEY ON 09/05/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12211894 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12035594.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12211894 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12035594.

WRIT RECEIVED ON 08/28/2017.

WRIT RECEIVED ON 08/28/2017.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/28/2017.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/28/2017.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4755120 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4755120 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4754849 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4754849 REJECTED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/03/2017

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/03/2017

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/17/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/17/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/03/2017

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/03/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JOHNSON, RONNEY ON 08/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JOHNSON, RONNEY ON 08/02/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JOHNSON, RONNEY ON 08/02/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JOHNSON, RONNEY ON 08/02/2017

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 07/19/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 07/19/2017

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12588846 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12412885.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT ISSUED ON 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4991644 RECEIVED ON 07/17/2019 04:18:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 09/14/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4765011 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3583509 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • EX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 09/14/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JOHNSON, RONNEY ON 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY JOHNSON, RONNEY ON 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JOHNSON, RONNEY ON 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1406496 RECEIVED ON 08/02/2017 09:06:04 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12190154 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12013854.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2574268 RECEIVED ON 07/19/2017 11:18:29 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less