This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/18/2018 at 08:52:50 (UTC).

THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. VS. LISA MING

Case Summary

On 08/22/2016 THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LISA MING. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC.

Defendant

LISA MING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 11/23/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 11/23/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 10/25/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 10/25/2016 09:00:00 AM.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/24/2016.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/24/2016.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MING, LISA ON 10/24/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MING, LISA ON 10/24/2016

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR STAY OF EXECUTION) FILED BY MING, LISA ON 10/24/2016

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR STAY OF EXECUTION) FILED BY MING, LISA ON 10/24/2016

WRIT RECEIVED 10/6/2016, ISSUED 10/12/2016

WRIT RECEIVED 10/6/2016, ISSUED 10/12/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 10/12/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 10/12/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 10/07/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 10/07/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12042089 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11866054.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12042089 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11866054.

WRIT RECEIVED ON 10/06/2016.

WRIT RECEIVED ON 10/06/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED ON 10/06/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED ON 10/06/2016.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 10/06/2016.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 10/06/2016.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 10/05/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 10/05/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 09/30/2016 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 09/30/2016 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 09/29/2016 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 09/29/2016 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 09/28/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 09/28/2016 09:00:00 AM.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/28/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/28/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 11/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 10/25/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • EX PARTE CONTINUED TO 10/26/2016 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • EX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 10/26/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • EX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 10/25/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/24/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MING, LISA ON 10/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR STAY OF EXECUTION) FILED BY MING, LISA ON 10/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT RECEIVED 10/6/2016, ISSUED 10/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MING, LISA ON 08/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • MING, LISA REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 08/30/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY MING, LISA ON 08/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12018571 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11842619.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4594707 RECEIVED ON 08/22/2016 03:21:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant