This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:16:32 (UTC).

THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. VS. JONG LEE

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JONG LEE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC.

Defendants

SONG KIM

JONG LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 12/10/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 12/10/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/12/2013

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 12/10/2013.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 12/10/2013.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 12/10/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 12/10/2013

APPLICATION AND ORDER (TO SERVE BY POSTING) RECEIVED ON 08/21/2013.

APPLICATION AND ORDER (TO SERVE BY POSTING) RECEIVED ON 08/21/2013.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11744107 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11568298.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11744107 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11568298.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 09/10/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 09/10/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11453252 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11277144.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11453252 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11277144.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/11/2015

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/11/2015

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 09/10/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 09/10/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/12/2013

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/11/13) RECEIVED ON 09/10/2013.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/11/13) RECEIVED ON 09/10/2013.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/11/2015

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/11/2015

WRIT (ISSUED 2/27/15) RECEIVED ON 02/11/2015.

WRIT (ISSUED 2/27/15) RECEIVED ON 02/11/2015.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 09/10/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 09/10/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/19/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/19/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF MEMORANDUM OF COSTS) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/19/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF MEMORANDUM OF COSTS) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/19/2016

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF MEMORANDUM OF COSTS) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4593979 RECEIVED ON 08/19/2016 02:41:14 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11744107 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11568298.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 2/27/15) RECEIVED ON 02/11/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4326910 RECEIVED ON 02/11/2015 04:32:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/22/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11436758 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11260670.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER (TO SERVE BY POSTING) RECEIVED ON 08/21/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1107483 RECEIVED ON 08/21/2013 12:32:10 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 462495 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 02:20:41 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less