This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/08/2023 at 03:42:05 (UTC).

THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION VS. SATURINA PENA

Case Summary

On 10/26/2022 THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SATURINA PENA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION

Defendant

SATURINA PENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Prenovost, Normandin, Dawe & Rocha, APC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION ON 10/26/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION ON 10/26/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION ON 10/26/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION ON 10/26/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION ON 10/26/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION ON 10/26/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13128301 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12956366.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13128301 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12956366.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/17/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/17/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION ON 11/08/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION ON 11/08/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION ON 11/08/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION ON 11/08/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: DOURBETAS; Department: C25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11062036 RECEIVED ON 11/08/2022 10:30:26 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION ON 11/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION ON 11/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/17/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13128301 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12956366.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31224889 RECEIVED ON 10/26/2022 04:14:13 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DOURBETAS, NICO ON 10/26/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION ON 10/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION ON 10/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION ON 10/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION A CORPORATION is a litigant