This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/29/2023 at 03:55:33 (UTC).

THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. VS. JOSEPH M. MUNDINE

Case Summary

On 02/14/2023 THE BEST SERVICE CO , INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSEPH M MUNDINE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Best Service Co., Inc.

Defendant

Joseph M. Mundine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Christopher Stapleton

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 02/14/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 02/14/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 02/14/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 02/14/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 02/14/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 02/14/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13180065 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13008192.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13180065 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13008192.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/20/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N15 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/20/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N15 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 03/06/2023

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 03/06/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: VU; Department: N15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 03/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41456213 RECEIVED ON 03/04/2023 01:28:10 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/20/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N15 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13180065 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13008192.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41447165 RECEIVED ON 02/12/2023 06:33:45 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER VU, NATHAN ON 02/14/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 02/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 02/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 02/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less