This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/29/2023 at 03:54:51 (UTC).

THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. VS. BRANDON DAVID OBLENES

Case Summary

On 02/14/2023 THE BEST SERVICE CO , INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRANDON DAVID OBLENES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Best Service Co., Inc.

Defendant

Brandon David Oblenes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Christopher Stapleton

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 02/14/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 02/14/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 02/14/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 02/14/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 02/14/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 02/14/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13178486 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13006601.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13178486 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13006601.

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 03/13/2023

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 03/13/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 03/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11113053 RECEIVED ON 03/12/2023 07:41:19 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13178486 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13006601.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 02/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 02/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC. ON 02/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41447166 RECEIVED ON 02/12/2023 06:39:48 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less