This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:13:10 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON VS. ALAN POPOFF

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ALAN POPOFF. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendants

ALAN POPOFF

ROBERT L. GARCIA

LUIS A. PULIDO

JAMIE D. GARCIA

SHERYL R. SUGLIA

DEBORAH L. PULIDO

ROBERT L. GARCIA JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WRIGHT, FINLAY & ZAK, LLP

Defendant Attorney

ROBERT A. BONITO & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 10/28/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 10/28/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 09/10/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 09/10/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITHOUT PREJUDICE/COMPLAINT) FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 12/06/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITHOUT PREJUDICE/COMPLAINT) FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 12/06/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 09/10/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 09/10/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 10/28/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 10/28/2013

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/04/2013 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/04/2013 08:30:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 465.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11489045 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11312957.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 465.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11489045 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11312957.

CASE REASSIGNED TO FREDERICK AGUIRRE EFFECTIVE 01/06/2014.

CASE REASSIGNED TO FREDERICK AGUIRRE EFFECTIVE 01/06/2014.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/04/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/04/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF MICHAEL J. GILLIGAN) FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 11/26/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF MICHAEL J. GILLIGAN) FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 11/26/2013

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 10/28/2013

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 10/28/2013

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 08/13/2013

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 08/13/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 08/12/2013

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 390715 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 390715 REJECTED.

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 12/02/2013

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 12/02/2013

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 12/17/2013

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 12/17/2013

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 12/17/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2296998 RECEIVED ON 12/17/2013 03:09:59 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO FREDERICK AGUIRRE EFFECTIVE 01/06/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITHOUT PREJUDICE/COMPLAINT) FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 12/06/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4116504 RECEIVED ON 12/06/2013 12:39:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 390715 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 12/02/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4113489 RECEIVED ON 12/02/2013 09:17:02 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2278065 RECEIVED ON 09/10/2013 12:17:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/04/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 08/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1105808 RECEIVED ON 08/13/2013 12:47:42 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MOSS, ROBERT ON 08/12/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430684 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254556.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 348181 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 11:41:04 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less