This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/15/2018 at 04:02:08 (UTC).

TERESA NIETO VS. VOLCOM, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/11/2016 TERESA NIETO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against VOLCOM, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TERESA NIETO

Defendants

KERING AMERICAS, INC.

VOLCOM RETAIL, LLC.

VOLCOM RETAIL OUTLETS, LLC

DECTON, INC.

PEDRO MARTIN

VOLCOM, LLC

MARTIN SERVIN MANRIQUEZ

MARTIN SERVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACKSON LAW, APC

Defendant Attorneys

GORDON & REES, LLP

CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

 

Court Documents

OPPOSITION FILED BY NIETO, TERESA ON 10/18/2017

OPPOSITION FILED BY NIETO, TERESA ON 10/18/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12238531 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12062211.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12238531 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12062211.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/17/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/17/2017

NOTICE - OTHER (OF UNAVAILABILITY) FILED BY SERVIN, MARTIN ON 10/02/2017

NOTICE - OTHER (OF UNAVAILABILITY) FILED BY SERVIN, MARTIN ON 10/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NIETO, TERESA ON 09/28/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NIETO, TERESA ON 09/28/2017

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VOLCOM, LLC ON 12/23/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VOLCOM, LLC ON 12/23/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4617212 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4617212 REJECTED.

OPPOSITION FILED BY KERING AMERICAS, INC.; VOLCOM RETAIL OUTLETS, LLC; VOLCOM RETAIL, LLC.; VOLCOM, LLC ON 11/23/2016

OPPOSITION FILED BY KERING AMERICAS, INC.; VOLCOM RETAIL OUTLETS, LLC; VOLCOM RETAIL, LLC.; VOLCOM, LLC ON 11/23/2016

STIPULATION AND ORDER (DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS) FILED BY KERING AMERICAS, INC.; VOLCOM RETAIL OUTLETS, LLC; VOLCOM RETAIL, LLC.; VOLCOM, LLC ON 09/12/2016

STIPULATION AND ORDER (DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS) FILED BY KERING AMERICAS, INC.; VOLCOM RETAIL OUTLETS, LLC; VOLCOM RETAIL, LLC.; VOLCOM, LLC ON 09/12/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/12/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/12/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/21/2016 10:32:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/21/2016 10:32:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12000559 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11824627.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12000559 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11824627.

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DECTON, INC. ON 07/15/2016

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DECTON, INC. ON 07/15/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY KERING AMERICAS, INC.; VOLCOM RETAIL OUTLETS, LLC; VOLCOM RETAIL, LLC.; VOLCOM, LLC ON 06/21/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY KERING AMERICAS, INC.; VOLCOM RETAIL OUTLETS, LLC; VOLCOM RETAIL, LLC.; VOLCOM, LLC ON 06/21/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY NIETO, TERESA ON 06/14/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY NIETO, TERESA ON 06/14/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NIETO, TERESA ON 06/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NIETO, TERESA ON 06/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NIETO, TERESA ON 06/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NIETO, TERESA ON 06/01/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11935087 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11759272.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11935087 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11759272.

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY NIETO, TERESA ON 11/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3610939 RECEIVED ON 11/27/2017 08:59:07 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY VOLCOM, LLC ON 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4779843 RECEIVED ON 10/20/2017 02:15:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3598288 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 10/18/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • JURY TRIAL CONTINUED TO 03/05/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/05/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
126 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2016
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER C.C.P. 170.6 AS TO THE HONORABLE GEOFFREY T. GLASS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO PETER WILSON EFFECTIVE 03/30/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. GEOFFREY GLASS) FILED BY NIETO, TERESA ON 03/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4520567 RECEIVED ON 03/21/2016 05:24:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GLASS, GEOFFREY ON 03/11/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11935087 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11759272.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NIETO, TERESA ON 03/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NIETO, TERESA ON 03/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY NIETO, TERESA ON 03/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4516022 RECEIVED ON 03/11/2016 12:59:48 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volcom, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KERING AMERICAS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Decton Inc is a litigant