This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:48:17 (UTC).

TED MOOREWOOD VS. WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 TED MOOREWOOD filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TED MOOREWOOD

Defendant

WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JML LAW

Defendant Attorney

BURKE, WILLIAMS & SORENSEN, LLP

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/16/2016 03:35:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/16/2016 03:35:00 PM.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/18/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/18/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY MOOREWOOD, TED ON 04/01/2016

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY MOOREWOOD, TED ON 04/01/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927315 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751540.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927315 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751540.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3408187 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3408187 REJECTED.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 02/26/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MOOREWOOD, TED ON 04/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MOOREWOOD, TED ON 04/15/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY MOOREWOOD, TED ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY MOOREWOOD, TED ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11963128 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11787267.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11963128 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11787267.

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC. ON 05/10/2016

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC. ON 05/10/2016

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC. ON 05/03/2016

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC. ON 05/03/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOOREWOOD, TED ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOOREWOOD, TED ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOOREWOOD, TED ON 04/01/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOOREWOOD, TED ON 04/01/2016

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/16/2016 03:35:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • THE CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE OMNIBUS CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO OMNI EFFECTIVE 05/16/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC. ON 05/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2461458 RECEIVED ON 05/10/2016 11:50:48 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11963128 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11787267.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC. ON 05/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1320065 RECEIVED ON 05/03/2016 01:00:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3408187 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2455454 RECEIVED ON 04/15/2016 10:50:53 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOOREWOOD, TED ON 04/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY MOOREWOOD, TED ON 04/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4526854 RECEIVED ON 04/01/2016 11:17:10 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/18/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927315 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751540.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOOREWOOD, TED ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MOOREWOOD, TED ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509541 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 11:37:43 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.