This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/12/2022 at 04:41:04 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. VS. KARMELL WALKER

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KARMELL WALKER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD Bank USA, N.A.

Defendant

Karmell Walker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rausch Sturm LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13051576 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12879592.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13051576 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12879592.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 05/19/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 05/19/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 05/19/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 05/19/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 05/19/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 05/19/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION OF VENUE) FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 05/24/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION OF VENUE) FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 05/24/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 06/10/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 06/10/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41345364 RECEIVED ON 06/10/2022 10:36:34 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 06/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1992402 RECEIVED ON 05/24/2022 01:28:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION OF VENUE) FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 05/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1990666 RECEIVED ON 05/19/2022 02:25:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 05/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 05/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TD BANK USA, N.A. ON 05/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13051576 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12879592.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant