This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/19/2023 at 08:41:22 (UTC).

TARIK HALWANI VS. WESTIN HOTEL MANAGEMENT, L.P.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2022 TARIK HALWANI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WESTIN HOTEL MANAGEMENT, L P. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tarik Halwani

Defendant

Westin Operator, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Gene J. Goldsman

Defendant Attorney

Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/06/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/06/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13094858 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12922860.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13094858 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12922860.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HALWANI, TARIK ON 08/19/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HALWANI, TARIK ON 08/19/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HALWANI, TARIK ON 08/19/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HALWANI, TARIK ON 08/19/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY HALWANI, TARIK ON 08/19/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY HALWANI, TARIK ON 08/19/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY HALWANI, TARIK ON 08/26/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY HALWANI, TARIK ON 08/26/2022

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY WESTIN HOTEL MANAGEMENT, L.P. ON 10/21/2022

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY WESTIN HOTEL MANAGEMENT, L.P. ON 10/21/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WESTIN OPERATOR, LLC ON 10/21/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WESTIN OPERATOR, LLC ON 10/21/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY WESTIN OPERATOR, LLC ON 10/21/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY WESTIN OPERATOR, LLC ON 10/21/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13127755 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12955820.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13127755 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12955820.

 

Docket Entries

02/06/2023

HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: DOURBETAS; Department: C25

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13127755 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12955820.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41401292 RECEIVED ON 10/21/2022 06:09:27 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY WESTIN OPERATOR, LLC ON 10/21/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WESTIN OPERATOR, LLC ON 10/21/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY WESTIN HOTEL MANAGEMENT, L.P. ON 10/21/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2022

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21225687 RECEIVED ON 10/21/2022 06:09:28 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY HALWANI, TARIK ON 08/26/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2022

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41377257 RECEIVED ON 08/26/2022 10:13:50 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/06/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13094858 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12922860.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2022

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11028041 RECEIVED ON 08/19/2022 11:08:04 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022

DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DOURBETAS, NICO ON 08/19/2022.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HALWANI, TARIK ON 08/19/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HALWANI, TARIK ON 08/19/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY HALWANI, TARIK ON 08/19/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less